Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Fernandez, Liliana, Fernandez, Pedro, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Reynolds, Robert A., Esq., against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Deere, Chioma R, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Liliana Fernandez and Pedro Fernandez against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation. The plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $15,000. The plaintiffs are residents of Broward County, Florida, and the defendant is a...
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 21, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 01, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 21, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 26, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: June 08, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: June 08, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 26, 2018Request for Production
Date: June 11, 2018Notice of Service
Date: June 11, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 20, 2018Stipulation
Date: January 29, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 26, 2018Notice
Date: March 26, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION ON FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFSParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition LILIANA FERNANDEZ 08/06/18 10:00 AM |
|
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition PEDRO FERNANDEZ 08/06/18 12:30 PM |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUESTParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' INTERROGATORIESParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.