Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hincapie, Alcira, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Chavin, Valorie S, against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Chackman, Steven Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Alcira Hincapie against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiff alleges that the insurance company breached the insurance policy by failing to fully compensate her for the damage to her home. The plai...
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 07, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 12, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 01, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 12, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: March 12, 2018Agreed Order
Date: March 14, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: March 16, 2018Motion to Compel Production
Date: June 08, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 27, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: March 22, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 27, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 11, 2018Privilege Log
Date: March 27, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 26, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 29, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Filing
Date: March 29, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: April 04, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 07, 2018Objection to Notice Production Under Rule 1.351
Date: April 09, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: April 10, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 30, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 11, 2018Agreed Order
Date: May 03, 2018Order Denying
Date: May 14, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Consent to Substitution of Counsel
Date: March 22, 2018Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: March 23, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 23, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 6/27/18 8:45 AM RM WW16160 |
|
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Production Party: Plaintiff Hincapie, Alcira |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Hincapie, Alcira |
|
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Denying AND OVERRULING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Compel DESIGNATION OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE AND DEPOSITION DATES |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY /GRANTED; PLTF SHLL RESPOND BY 5/30/18 |
|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Hincapie, Alcira |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.