Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ellison, John Jack, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Castrataro, George W, Esq., against Reitano, Diane, represented by Gerow, Jeffrey Scott, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Fahnestock, Fabienne E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a civil action filed by John "Jack" Ellison against the Estate of Donald Cherubini and Diane Reitano, as Personal Representative. Ellison alleges breach of contract and seeks partition of real properties located in Broward County, F...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Motion for More Definite Statement
Date: March 19, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Agreed Order
Date: April 09, 2018Motion for Judgment
Date: September 20, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: August 06, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: May 07, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: August 01, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: June 26, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 12, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: February 08, 2019Motion
Date: August 03, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 27, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: September 24, 2018Order Granting
Date: January 08, 2019Request to Produce
Date: January 20, 2019Order Extending Time
Date: April 29, 2019Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: February 18, 2019Answer Affirmative Defenses & Counterclaim
Date: January 20, 2019Notice of Filing Interrogs
Date: June 27, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: March 06, 2019Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: July 26, 2019Notice of Service
Date: August 27, 2019Notice of Service
Date: August 29, 2019Motion to Amend Answer
Date: August 21, 2019Agreed Order
Date: August 22, 2019Order Extending Time
Date: July 31, 2019Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: August 30, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: November 18, 2019Satisfaction
Date: May 14, 2020Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: October 04, 2019Order Granting Motion for Judgment
Date: February 11, 2020Order to Show Cause
Date: May 16, 2021Motion for More Definite Statement
Date: May 31, 2018Amended Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 28, 2018Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 23, 2019Answer to Complaint
Date: February 22, 2019Order Denying Motion to Strike
Date: April 02, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: September 04, 2019Request for Production
Date: September 06, 2019Response to Notice to Produce
Date: November 07, 2019Notice of Withdrawal
Date: November 21, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: December 02, 2019Response to Motion for Judgment
Date: January 02, 2020Affidavit of Costs
Date: February 05, 2020Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim
Date: May 20, 2020Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: April 12, 2021Amended Motion
Date: February 22, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: May 24, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause May 26, 2021 |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim Party: Defendant Reitano, Diane |
|
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction OF ORDERParty: Defendant Reitano, Diane |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion for Judgment ON PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT AND THE DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIM FOR PARTITION |
|
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion for Judgment Party: Plaintiff Ellison, John Jack |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel DEFENDANT TO GIVE COMPLETE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONParty: Plaintiff Ellison, John Jack |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REOUEST FOR PRODUCTIONParty: Plaintiff Ellison, John Jack |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.