Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Zachariades, George, Zachariades, Phrsosso, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kaufman, Daniel L, against Jetro Restaurant Depot Llc, represented by Squire, Robert J, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryNeg - Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by the Plaintiffs, Phrosso Zachariades and George Zachariades, against the Defendant, Jetro Restaurant Depot, LLC, also known as Restaurant Depot, LLC. The Plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $15,000. The Plaintiffs we...
Privilege Log
Date: September 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: September 12, 2018Re-Notice of Mediation
Date: April 26, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: April 30, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: September 12, 2018Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: April 30, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: November 09, 2018Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 22, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: May 07, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 09, 2018Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: May 13, 2019Supplemental Interrogatories
Date: November 30, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 05, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 22, 2018Witness & Exhibit List
Date: May 24, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 28, 2019Motion
Date: January 23, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 28, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: February 01, 2019Request for Production of Documents
Date: February 28, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 28, 2018Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: February 20, 2019Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: April 02, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: February 20, 2019Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 10, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: February 22, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: April 23, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 23, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: February 22, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: April 23, 2018Order Denying Motion
Date: February 25, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 24, 2018Witness & Exhibit List
Date: March 19, 2019Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 29, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: April 24, 2018Privilege Log
Date: April 24, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 08, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 03, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 17, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 20, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: June 20, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 18, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 20, 2018Certificate
Date: April 23, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: June 28, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 29, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: April 23, 2019Notice of Video Deposition
Date: April 24, 2019Agreed Order
Date: August 10, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 26, 2018Order Setting
Date: August 13, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 26, 2018Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: April 26, 2019Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: October 02, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: October 08, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 08, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: October 08, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: October 11, 2019Proposed Jury Instructions
Date: October 11, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 13, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 20, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: October 11, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 11, 2019Notice
Date: August 22, 2019Certificate
Date: June 14, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: May 29, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: August 22, 2019Motion to be Excused from Trial Docket
Date: June 21, 2019Witness & Exhibit List
Date: June 03, 2019Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation
Date: August 23, 2019Notice
Date: October 11, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 30, 2019Notice
Date: August 02, 2019Order
Date: October 11, 2019Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation
Date: August 24, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: October 08, 2019Subpoena for Trial Returned Served
Date: November 06, 2019Mediation Report
Date: June 25, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 27, 2019Response to Motion
Date: October 11, 2019Order Resetting
Date: August 28, 2019Notice
Date: June 25, 2019Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: May 29, 2019Notice of Video Deposition
Date: August 29, 2019Witness & Exhibit List
Date: June 07, 2019Order Resetting
Date: June 30, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: September 03, 2019Objection
Date: June 30, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: May 29, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: September 05, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: June 11, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: August 06, 2019Notice of Video Deposition
Date: September 05, 2019Amended Witness List
Date: July 10, 2019Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: October 09, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: July 05, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: July 29, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: October 09, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 10, 2019Motion
Date: July 26, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 30, 2019Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: October 10, 2019Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: October 02, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 26, 2019Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: September 11, 2019Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation
Date: August 23, 2019Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation
Date: August 24, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 10, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Subpoena for Trial Returned Served 10th day of October, 2019 |
|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Jury Instructions Party: Plaintiff Zachariades, Phrsosso |
|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice OF SETTLEMENTParty: Defendant Jetro Restaurant Depot LLC |
|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Pre-Trial Conference |
|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S AMENDED MOTION IN LIMINEParty: Plaintiff Zachariades, Phrsosso Plaintiff Zachariades, George |
|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Issued By Attorney DANNY BRAVO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.