Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Quinones, Raoul, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Santiago, Maximo A, Esq., against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Brant, Todd E, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Raoul Quinones against Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that there was a homeowners insurance policy in effect, but the Insured has been unable to locate a copy of the policy. The pro...
Request for Production
Date: January 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Order Correcting Scrivener's Error
Date: October 08, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: January 17, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: May 20, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: September 13, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: September 17, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: September 17, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: September 17, 2019Interrogatories
Date: January 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Service
Date: February 07, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 14, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 24, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: March 24, 2018Consent to Substitution of Counsel
Date: August 01, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 14, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: August 01, 2018Motion
Date: October 08, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: October 09, 2018Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: January 16, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: January 17, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 28, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 29, 2019Witness List
Date: May 20, 2019Exhibit List
Date: May 20, 2019Witness & Exhibit List
Date: May 21, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 27, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: September 13, 2019Agreed Order
Date: September 19, 2018Request for Production
Date: August 27, 2019Request to Produce
Date: March 28, 2019Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: October 17, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: September 18, 2019Privilege Log
Date: January 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENTParty: Plaintiff Quinones, Raoul | |
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine THIRDParty: Plaintiff Quinones, Raoul |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine SECONDParty: Plaintiff Quinones, Raoul |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine FIRSTParty: Plaintiff Quinones, Raoul |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance DEFENDANT'SParty: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Witness & Exhibit List | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Expert Witness List |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.