Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Jean, Rosemonde, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Mineo, Peter John, against Certain Underwriters At Lloyds London, represented by Flagg, Clinton D, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Rosemonde Jean against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London subscribing to Policy Number HH03 65486. The plaintiff is seeking damages in excess of $15,000, exclusive of interest, attorney fees, and costs. The defendant i...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: March 12, 2018Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted
Date: March 12, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: April 11, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: April 11, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: April 11, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 18, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 18, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 26, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 02, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: April 11, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: May 30, 2018Objection
Date: June 29, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 01, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Objection Party: Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds london |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds london |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Party: Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds london |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories Party: Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds london |
|
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds london |
|
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability Party: Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds london |
|
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds london |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.