Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Pembroke Isles Homeowners Association Inc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Stivelman, Alessandra, against Jaime, Julio C., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Other - $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Pembroke Isles Homeowners Association, Inc. against Julio C. Jaime and other defendants. The plaintiff, Pembroke Isles Homeowners Association, is a Florida not-for-profit corporation responsible for ope...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: February 28, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: January 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: November 19, 2018Release of Lis Pendens
Date: September 12, 2019Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: September 16, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Release of Lis Pendens | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance John Doe |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Jane Doe |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Spouse of Julio C Jaime if any |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Lis Pendens | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.