Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Calhoune, Christopher, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pugliese, Michael Ignazio, against Broward County, represented by Williams-Leon, Shannon, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by the Plaintiff, Christopher Calhoun, against the Defendant, Broward County. The Plaintiff alleges that on August 4, 2016, while riding his bicycle on Powerline Road in Broward County, Florida, he was struck by a Broward Coun...
Response to Request for Production
Date: March 22, 2018Amended
Date: November 30, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: December 07, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: December 14, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: December 17, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: January 07, 2019Request for Admissions
Date: January 17, 2019Response to Request for Admissions
Date: January 17, 2019Witness List
Date: January 25, 2019Request to Produce
Date: February 14, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 15, 2019Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories
Date: February 14, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 14, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: March 27, 2019Request to Produce
Date: April 03, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: April 12, 2019Request for Copies
Date: May 02, 2019Mediation Report
Date: June 05, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: July 05, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 07, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: July 08, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: August 02, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 02, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 02, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 13, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 13, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 14, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 14, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 14, 2018Avoidance of Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 15, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 22, 2018Request to Produce
Date: February 22, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: February 26, 2018Request for Production
Date: February 26, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 26, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 08, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 22, 2018Order Compelling Discovery
Date: April 10, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: April 10, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 11, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 11, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: June 07, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 21, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: July 09, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: July 13, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: July 17, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 10, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 13, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: August 20, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: August 20, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: September 18, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: September 24, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: September 25, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: September 26, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: October 05, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: October 09, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: October 15, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: October 22, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 24, 2018Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: November 02, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: November 06, 2018Request for Copies
Date: November 08, 2018Motion to Set Cause for Trial
Date: November 28, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: November 30, 2018Order Setting
Date: December 04, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: December 07, 2018Motion to Set Cause for Trial
Date: December 10, 2018Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: December 10, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: December 13, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: December 14, 2018Request for Production
Date: December 14, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: December 19, 2018Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: December 20, 2018Order Granting
Date: January 08, 2019Response to Request for Admissions
Date: January 11, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 15, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: January 23, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 22, 2019Re-Notice of Mediation
Date: February 23, 2019Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: February 23, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: February 23, 2019Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories
Date: February 25, 2019Request for Production
Date: February 25, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: March 01, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: March 08, 2019Motion for Protective Order
Date: March 14, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 16, 2019Amended
Date: March 18, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: March 19, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 26, 2019Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 29, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: April 03, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: April 10, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 10, 2019Opposition
Date: April 10, 2019Amended Witness List
Date: April 12, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: April 12, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: April 12, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: April 12, 2019Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part
Date: April 12, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: April 15, 2019Request for Copies
Date: April 15, 2019Amended Witness List
Date: April 16, 2019Notice of Medical Exam
Date: April 16, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: April 17, 2019Order Extending Time
Date: April 17, 2019Consent
Date: April 22, 2019Order Resetting
Date: April 23, 2019Order Granting
Date: April 23, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: April 25, 2019Order Resetting
Date: April 23, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 02, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: May 02, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: May 07, 2019Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 07, 2019Privilege Log
Date: May 09, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 10, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: July 09, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 16, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: July 17, 2019Amended
Date: August 05, 2019Order On Case Management Conference
Date: August 08, 2019Re-Notice
Date: August 05, 2019Order Resetting
Date: August 08, 2019Order
Date: August 08, 2019Order Setting Jury Trial
Date: August 08, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: August 16, 2019Order Setting Jury Trial
Date: August 08, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: September 19, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: September 17, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 19, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: January 11, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: June 08, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 23, 2019Agreed Order
Date: February 24, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order On Case Management Conference Sept 24, 2019 |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting CALENDAR CALL 11-22-2019 9:00 AM |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Sue Aponte Case Management Conference |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Jury Trial Trial |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Jury Trial Nov 22, 2019 |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Amended SECOND NOTICE OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION ON WEDNESDAY, 10/30/19 @ 2:30 PM |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Re-Notice OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION ON WEDNESDAY OCTOBER 30, 2019 @ 2:00 PMParty: Defendant Broward County |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.