Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Meldung, Daniel, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Smoler, Bruce Jay, against Dos Santos, Vinicius, Viga Carpentry Inc, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Daniel Meldung, as the personal representative of the estate of Jacob Meldung, against Viga Carpentry, Inc. and Vinicius Dos Santos. The complaint alleges breach of contract and fraud.
According to the complaint, Jacob Me...
Summons Returned Served
Date: February 01, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: June 11, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: June 11, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: June 11, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: February 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 04/22/2019 at 08:45 am rm 15165 |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit Vinicius Dos Santos |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default AgainstParty: Defendant Viga Carpentry Inc Defendant Dos Santos, Vinicius |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 2/12/2018Party: Defendant Dos Santos, Vinicius |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 01/29/18Party: Defendant Viga Carpentry Inc |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance ISSUED ON: VIGA CARPENTRY, INC |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance ISSUED ON: VINICIUS DOS SANTOS |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Meldung, Daniel |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: BRUCE J. SMOLER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A013083; ;Amount: $10.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.