Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Craig, Carmella, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Low, David, Esq., against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Rodriguez, Lazaro C, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Carmella Craig against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiff alleges damages exceeding $15,000, exclusive of interest, costs, and attorney's fees. The plaintiff is a resident of Broward County, Flor...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 26, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 26, 2018Notice
Date: February 14, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 10, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 21, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: March 21, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 26, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: June 23, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: June 29, 2018Consent to Substitution of Counsel
Date: June 29, 2018Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: August 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Order for Substitution of Counsel | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel Lazaro C. Rodriguez, EsquireParty: Defendant Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Consent to Substitution of Counsel | |
June 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Craig, Carmella |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company |
|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company |
|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Summons- 2/2/2018Party: Defendant Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.