Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Kahan, Maurice, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Pro Se, against Safepoint Insurance Company, represented by Allen, Curtis Lee, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Fahnestock, Fabienne E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Maurice Kahan against Safepoint Insurance Company. The plaintiff is seeking damages in excess of $15,000. The plaintiff is a resident of Broward County, Florida, and the defendant is a Florida corporation authorized to do b...
Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint
Date: March 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 26, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 05, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: February 22, 2018Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 19, 2018Cross Notice
Date: March 26, 2018Agreed Order
Date: April 13, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 29, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 29, 2018Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 09, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 08, 2018Motion
Date: May 02, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: May 15, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: May 15, 2018Order
Date: July 09, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: August 08, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 25, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 15, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: November 01, 2018Motion for Sanctions
Date: November 06, 2018Request for Production
Date: December 12, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: December 12, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 11, 2019Motion
Date: January 15, 2019Request for Copies
Date: January 16, 2019Response to Motion for Judgment
Date: January 31, 2019Motion to Withdraw
Date: June 03, 2019Notice
Date: March 13, 2019Order Granting Motion to Withdraw
Date: July 22, 2019Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: July 18, 2019Notice of Compliance
Date: August 27, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: December 23, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: April 23, 2021Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: February 16, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: April 23, 2021Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 22, 2021Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: April 23, 2021Request for Production
Date: January 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: March 06, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: March 19, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: March 21, 2018Reply
Date: May 01, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 28, 2018Notice for/of Trial
Date: September 28, 2018Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: October 04, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: October 10, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: December 12, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 06, 2019Mediation Report
Date: March 25, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: January 17, 2019Notice of Compliance
Date: February 19, 2019Order Denying Motion for Judgment
Date: February 06, 2019Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: January 29, 2019Order On Case Status Conference
Date: February 06, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: June 07, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: July 22, 2019Notice of Compliance
Date: July 26, 2019Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: November 18, 2020Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: March 04, 2022Consent to Substitution of Counsel
Date: April 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Substitution of Counsel | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Consent for Substitution of CounselParty: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Consent to Substitution of Counsel | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.