Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Weston, Deborah, Weston, Douglas, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Quincel, Tracey Renee, against Federated National Insurance Company, represented by Sharpe, Laurie, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Douglas and Deborah Weston against Federated National Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $15,000, exclusive of interest, attorney fees, and costs. The defendant is an insurance company author...
Request for Admissions
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 05, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Service
Date: February 14, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 09, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: March 09, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 23, 2018Agreed Order
Date: March 28, 2018Agreed Order
Date: March 28, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: April 11, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 27, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: May 04, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: May 04, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: May 14, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: May 14, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: May 14, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 14, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 14, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 13, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: June 05, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time To Respond TO Defendant's Discovery DemandsParty: Plaintiff Weston, Douglas Plaintiff Weston, Deborah |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production of Documents | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.