Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Williams, Pearl Y, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Low, David, Esq., against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Groelle, Robert C, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Pearl Y. Williams against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiff is seeking damages exceeding $15,000, exclusive of interest, costs, and attorney's fees. The plaintiff is a resident of Broward County...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 26, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 26, 2018Notice
Date: February 07, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 27, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 27, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 22, 2018Stipulation & Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: March 07, 2018Notice of Interrogatories
Date: March 22, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 05, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 10, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 22, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 05, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: June 05, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: May 02, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: April 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REOUESTSParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatories Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order for Substitution of Counsel FOR DEFT, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALT INS CO |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.