Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Packler, Michael, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Santiago, Maximo A, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Michael Packler against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation. The complaint alleges that there was a homeowners insurance policy in effect, with a policy number of 00963112, which covered the property located at 1022 SW ...
Request for Production
Date: January 26, 2018Interrogatories
Date: January 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 22, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 14, 2018Motion
Date: February 23, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: January 22, 2019Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: January 17, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Service
Date: February 07, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 08, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Packler, Michael |
|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion TO STAY BREACH OF CONTRACTParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production OF DOCUMENTS TO CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATIONParty: Plaintiff Packler, Michael |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories ON CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATIONParty: Plaintiff Packler, Michael |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Packler, Michael |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.