Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Ingino, Michael James, against Auguste, Jean, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with McCarthy, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC against Jean Auguste in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The complaint states that the defendant executed a Florida Motor Vehicle Lease Agreement on or...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 21, 2019eSummons Issuance - Pluries
Date: March 22, 2019Summons Returned Unserved
Date: July 02, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: July 02, 2018Order of Disqualification
Date: February 08, 2018eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: October 10, 2018Showing of Good Cause
Date: September 28, 2020Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: September 22, 2020Summons Returned Unserved
Date: May 09, 2019eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: September 25, 2020Non-Military Affidavit
Date: November 17, 2020Affidavit
Date: December 02, 2020Affidavit of Indebtedness
Date: December 02, 2020Affidavit of Costs
Date: December 02, 2020Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: December 29, 2020Writ of Garnishment Returned Served
Date: June 28, 2021Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: January 18, 2021Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: April 27, 2021Motion for Garnishment After Judgment
Date: June 22, 2021Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 06, 2021Answer of Garnishee
Date: July 02, 2021Voluntary Dismissal of Garnishment
Date: July 23, 2021Notice to Defendant of Right Against Garnishment
Date: June 29, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: July 02, 2018Alias Summons Returned Served
Date: October 15, 2020Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: December 01, 2020Motion for Default & Default
Date: November 17, 2020Motion for Entry of Default Final Judgment
Date: December 02, 2020Motion to Vacate Final Judgment
Date: January 12, 2021Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: January 29, 2021Subpoena Returned Served
Date: May 10, 2021eWrit Issuance - Garnishment
Date: June 22, 2021Claim of Exemption and Request for Hearing
Date: July 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal of Garnishment | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Claim of Exemption and Request for Hearing | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer of Garnishee | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice to Defendant of Right Against Garnishment OF WAGES, MONEY, AND OTHER PROPERTYParty: Plaintiff Ford Motor Credit Company LLC |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment Returned Served 25th day of June, 2021 / JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Garnishment After Judgment Garnishee JP Morgan Chase Bank NA Amount $19,188.11Party: Plaintiff Ford Motor Credit Company LLC |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
eWrit Issuance - Garnishment Garnishee JP Morgan Chase Bank NA Amount $19,188.11Party: Defendant Auguste, Jean |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Subpoena Returned Served | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Issued By Attorney TO: Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production From Non-Party TO: JEAN AUGUSTE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.