Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Tarber, Marietta, filed a(n) Nursing Home - Torts case represented by Discepola, Joseph P, against 4200 Washington Street Operations Llc, represented by Shistle, Jonathan David, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryNeg - Nursing Home Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeNursing Home |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Marietta Tarber, both individually and as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alton Thomas Tarber, against 4200 Washington Street Operations, LLC, doing business as Hillcrest Health Care and Rehabilitation Center. ...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Response
Date: June 06, 2018Answer to Interrogs
Date: June 21, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 18, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: June 21, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 10, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: August 06, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: September 04, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: September 04, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Filing
Date: September 04, 2018Request for Production
Date: September 04, 2018Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: October 29, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: December 06, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: October 29, 2018Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: January 24, 2019Witness List
Date: March 01, 2019Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: February 22, 2019Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: February 06, 2019Agreed Order
Date: March 04, 2019Exhibits
Date: March 04, 2019Witness List
Date: March 04, 2019Agreed Order
Date: March 07, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 18, 2019Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 08, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: March 27, 2019Agreed Order
Date: March 05, 2019Agreed Order
Date: March 04, 2019Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: April 02, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 13, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: April 02, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: March 29, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: April 24, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 08, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 22, 2019Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories
Date: April 26, 2019Order Denying Motion for Continuance
Date: May 10, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: June 05, 2019Request to Produce
Date: April 26, 2019Request to Produce
Date: April 26, 2019Notice of Service
Date: May 29, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: June 06, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: May 29, 2019Certificate
Date: May 24, 2019Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: May 29, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: October 03, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 01, 2018Motion to Abate
Date: February 26, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: May 26, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 26, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 11, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: June 21, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 10, 2018Notice of Withdrawal
Date: July 16, 2018Agreed Order
Date: July 17, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: July 31, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: September 06, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: October 02, 2018Request to Produce
Date: September 06, 2018Motion
Date: October 01, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: October 03, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: October 03, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: October 15, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: October 15, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 15, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: November 02, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: February 01, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 06, 2019Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: February 07, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: April 02, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: June 03, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: June 06, 2019Request to Produce
Date: May 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Served | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Tarber, Marietta |
|
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Interrogatories & Notice of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.