Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Kepley, Kenneth Colin, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Alper, Joshua B, against Biscayne Construction Company Inc, Laing, Ronald A, represented by Osborne, Jonathan Kent, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with McCarthy, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint involves Kenneth Colin Kepley (referred to as "Kepley" or the "Plaintiff") filing a complaint against Biscayne Construction Company, Inc. (referred to as "Biscayne" or the "Company") and Ronald A. Laing (referred to as "Laing") in the ...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 25, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 25, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 08, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: August 27, 2018Good Faith Form
Date: August 27, 2018Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: December 07, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: February 28, 2019Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: May 02, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: May 02, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 02, 2019Order to Withdraw As Counsel
Date: May 09, 2019Answer to Counterclaim
Date: July 26, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: August 09, 2019Order Extending Time
Date: August 12, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: September 12, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 29, 2019Agreed Order
Date: January 30, 2020Notice
Date: March 09, 2021Notice of Postponement of Deposition DT
Date: April 30, 2021Witness List
Date: July 20, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: August 18, 2021Notice of Video Deposition
Date: July 29, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 19, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 19, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: March 13, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 15, 2018Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 17, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: August 24, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: September 14, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: October 05, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: November 05, 2018Agreed Order Granting
Date: November 05, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: December 07, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: March 07, 2019Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: March 11, 2019Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 19, 2019Motion to Withdraw
Date: May 02, 2019Motion to Withdraw
Date: May 02, 2019Agreed Order Granting
Date: May 09, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: May 15, 2019Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: May 09, 2019Answer Affirmative Defenses & Counterclaim
Date: May 29, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 17, 2019Agreed Order
Date: June 11, 2019Request for Production of Documents
Date: July 03, 2019Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 26, 2019Agreed Order
Date: July 15, 2019Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim
Date: July 26, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: August 23, 2019Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 05, 2019Order Extending Time
Date: October 11, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 30, 2019Joint Motion
Date: January 29, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 15, 2020Notice of Unavailability
Date: February 24, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: October 14, 2020Motion for Protective Order
Date: October 21, 2020Notice of Acceptance of Service of Process
Date: November 06, 2020Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 09, 2020Agreed Order
Date: November 19, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 20, 2020Request for Production
Date: January 15, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: February 24, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: March 02, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: March 10, 2021Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: April 07, 2021Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: April 01, 2021Notice
Date: April 13, 2021Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: April 19, 2021Notice of Video Deposition
Date: May 26, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: June 09, 2021Request for Production
Date: July 15, 2021Notice of Unavailability
Date: June 08, 2021Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 29, 2021Order Compelling Discovery
Date: September 03, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: August 24, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: September 07, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: November 09, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: April 17, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: October 22, 2018Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Compelling Discovery /PLTF, GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO OVERRULE DEFENDANT BISCAYNE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.'S OBJECTIONS AND COMPELDISCOVERYParty: Plaintiff Kepley, Kenneth Colin |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition Ronald A. Laing |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order NON-PARTY SKILCON, INC'S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO... |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.