Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Unicorn Funding Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rodriguez, Roniel, Iv, against Beacon Fisheries Inc, Cemco International Corp, Granmar Products Inc, Gustafsson, Anders, Salmon And Salmon Seafood Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Ramirez, Giorgio L., Esq., Smith, Jeffrey B, Sperling, Stephen M, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Comm Foreclosure - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a legal action filed by Unicorn Funding, LLC against CEMCO International Corp., Anders Gustafsson, Granmar Products, Inc., Beacon Fisheries, Inc., and Salmon and Salmon Seafood, LLC. The purpose of the action is to foreclose a mortg...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 25, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 25, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 08, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 08, 2018Motion to Intervene
Date: February 20, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 20, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 20, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 06, 2018Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer
Date: March 06, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: March 08, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: January 24, 2018Amended Lis Pendens
Date: January 25, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 25, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 25, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 25, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 08, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 08, 2018Answer
Date: February 09, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 13, 2018Motion for Default
Date: March 06, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: March 06, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: March 08, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default againstParty: Defendant Gustafsson, Anders |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit | |
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Salmon and Salmon Seafood LLC |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer MOTION TO STRIKE AND FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT, BEACON FISHERIES, INCParty: Plaintiff Unicorn Funding LLC |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default BY THE COURTParty: Plaintiff Unicorn Funding LLC |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Party: Defendant Salmon and Salmon Seafood LLC |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Intervene MALANDA IMMOBILARE CORP'S (CEMCO INTERNATIONAL CQRP-,?S TRANSFEREE-MOTION TO INTERVENE |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time CEMCO INTERNATIONAL CORP.'S TRANSFEREE, MALANDA IMMOBILARE CORP.'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME T RESPOND TO PLAINTIEF'S-CQMPLAINTParty: Defendant Cemco International Corp |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Granmar Products Inc |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 13th day of February, 2018Party: Defendant Salmon and Salmon Seafood LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.