Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
1 Global Capital Llc, Koffel Associates, Inc, Koffel, William E., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Bannan, Courtney Jared, Esq., Burnett, Sheldon J, against Koffel Associates Inc, Koffel, William E, Rapid Financial Services, Llc, represented by Burnett, Sheldon J, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with McCarthy, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by 1 Global Capital LLC, also known as 187 Global Capital LLC, against Koffel Associates, Inc., a Maryland corporation, and William E. Koffel individually. The complaint alleges breach of a merchant agreement between the parti...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 08, 2018Stipulation
Date: October 15, 2018Case Management Order
Date: August 04, 2021Case Management Order
Date: September 21, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: November 16, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: March 23, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: March 15, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: April 29, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 06, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 17, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: April 30, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: April 30, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 16, 2019Notice
Date: March 15, 2019Order Resetting Hearing
Date: January 23, 2020Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: January 17, 2020Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: December 16, 2020Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: February 08, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: February 12, 2021Order On Case Management Conference
Date: February 17, 2021Motion for Default
Date: March 11, 2021Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint
Date: August 09, 2021Motion for Continuance
Date: August 10, 2021Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 23, 2021Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: August 11, 2021Order On Case Management Conference
Date: October 21, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: October 25, 2021Motion to Withdraw
Date: January 17, 2022Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: December 10, 2021Request for Production
Date: December 23, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: January 19, 2022Case Management Order
Date: January 27, 2022Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: January 21, 2022Notice of Unavailability
Date: January 28, 2022Ex Parte Order
Date: February 03, 2022Exhibits
Date: February 03, 2022Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: March 15, 2022Answer and Counterclaim
Date: March 28, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: October 25, 2021Notice of Service
Date: October 20, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: November 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer and Counterclaim DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMParty: Defendant Koffel Associates Inc Defendant Koffel, William E |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Hearing | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Order granting motion to reschedule case management conference |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Ex Parte Emereencv Motion to Reschedule Case Management Conference |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Order | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time Party: Plaintiff 1 Global Capital LLC |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.