Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Commission Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Narvaez, Rosana, Esq., against Carbia, Humberto, Prime Realty Services Referral Group Inc, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with McCarthy, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Commission Funding, LLC, doing business as Commission Express Florida Atlantic, against defendants Humberto Carbia and Prime Realty Services Referral Group, Inc. The complaint states that Commission Funding is in the factor...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: February 23, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: February 23, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: August 08, 2018Affidavit of Interest
Date: September 23, 2018Affidavit of Indebtedness
Date: September 04, 2018Motion for Final Judgment of Default
Date: October 12, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: January 02, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 25, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 06, 2018Affidavit of Costs
Date: August 29, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: November 30, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: March 11, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: September 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Final Judgment of Default Party: Plaintiff Commission Funding LLC |
|
September 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Interest | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Indebtedness | |
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default AGAINSTParty: Defendant Carbia, Humberto |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 03/09/18Party: Defendant Carbia, Humberto |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.