Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
New Penn Financial Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Swartz, Sean Matthew, against Deleo, Jerry J, Kohberger, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a verified complaint for foreclosure of a mortgage filed by New Penn Financial LLC, doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, against Jerry J. DeLeo and Jennifer Kohberger in the Circuit Court of the Seventeenth Judicial Circ...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Order of Referral to General Magistrate
Date: April 05, 2018Order Setting
Date: April 06, 2018Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale
Date: July 16, 2018Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale
Date: July 18, 2018Motion to Vacate Judgment
Date: August 15, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Comment: original note and mortgage document return request completed for RAS on 11/15/18. |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Judgment Party: Plaintiff New Penn Financial LLC |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: M GEVINSON ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A110484; ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE CREATED FOR ORGINAL DOCS |
|
July 24, 2018 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale GRANTED |
|
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication July 24, 2018 |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale Party: Plaintiff New Penn Financial LLC |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 7/18/2018 8:30am #14160 |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Electronic Sale Fee Paid Payor: M GEVINSON ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A092295; ;Amount: $60.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.