Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Castillo, Michelle, Harris, Phil, Iv, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Korin, Jonathan, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Deere, Chioma R, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Michelle Castillo and Phil Harris IV against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation. The plaintiffs are homeowners in Florida and the defendant is a Florida insurance company. The complaint alleges breach of contract and s...
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 06, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 20, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 20, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 21, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 09, 2018Order
Date: April 25, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: May 08, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: May 10, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: May 08, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: June 11, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 22, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 01, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 24, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 10, 2018Notice of Service
Date: May 22, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 24, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: August 01, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: July 30, 2018Notice
Date: August 02, 2018Ex Parte Motion
Date: July 25, 2018Interrogatories
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 06, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 13, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: March 14, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 21, 2018Motion to Stay
Date: April 06, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: March 26, 2018Agreed Order
Date: April 27, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 04, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 21, 2018Agreed Order
Date: July 30, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Change of AttorneyParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Party: Plaintiff Castillo, Michelle Plaintiff Harris, Phil, IV |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint PLAINTIFFS' SECONDParty: Plaintiff Castillo, Michelle Plaintiff Harris, Phil, IV |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON PARTE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Motion TO COMPEL DISCOVERY ANSWERS/RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIFFParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint FIRSTParty: Plaintiff Castillo, Michelle Plaintiff Harris, Phil, IV |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.