Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
1 Global Capital LLC Plaintiff vs. Magnanimous Kids Childcare Svc LLC, et al Defendant
On January 24, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 24, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT II Breach of Guaranty against JESSICA KINSALE
CONSTITUTE A SEPARATE CAUSE OF ACTION FOR FRAUD OR INTENTIONAL MISREPRESENTATION.
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Oct 29, 2019Notice
Date: Mar 15, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: Jan 25, 2019Notice of Action
Date: Jun 21, 2018Notice of Action
Date: Jun 21, 2018Certificate of Mailing
Date: Jun 21, 2018Certificate of Mailing
Date: Jun 21, 2018Affidavit of Constructive Service of Process
Date: Jun 12, 2018Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: May 04, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: Apr 18, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: Apr 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 24, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CHANGE OF D/B/A NAMEParty: Plaintiff 1 Global Capital LLC |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Plaintiff 1 Global Capital LLC |
|
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Action Magnanimous Kids Childcare SVC LLC / CDBREParty: Plaintiff 1 Global Capital LLC |
|
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Action Jessica Kinsale / CDBREParty: Plaintiff 1 Global Capital LLC |
|
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing Party: Defendant Kinsale, Jessica |
|
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing Party: Defendant Magnanimous Kids Childcare Svc LLC |
|
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Copy to Daily Business Review Jessica Kinsale |
|
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Copy to Daily Business Review Magnanimous Kids Childcare Svc LLC |
|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Constructive Service of Process Party: Plaintiff 1 Global Capital LLC Defendant Magnanimous Kids Childcare Svc LLC Defendant Kinsale, Jessica |
|
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit Party: Plaintiff 1 Global Capital LLC |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Party: Defendant Magnanimous Kids Childcare Svc LLC |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved JESSICA KINSALE |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: COURTNEY JARED BANNAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A011882; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: COURTNEY JARED BANNAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A011882; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Jessica KinsaleParty: Plaintiff 1 Global Capital LLC |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance MAGNANIMOUS KIDS CHILDCARE SVC. LLCParty: Plaintiff 1 Global Capital LLC |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |