Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Pod 2 At Monarch Lakes Property Owners Association, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Pearl, Andrea L, Esq., against Caamano, Gissell, South Florida 954 Cars Corp, represented by Eaton, Tiffany Jo, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Other - $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by POD 2 at Monarch Lakes Property Owners Association, Inc. against Gissell Caamano, the unknown spouse of Gissell Caamano, South Florida 954 Cars, Corp., and several fictitious tenants. The Association al...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Lis Pendens
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 31, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 02, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 09, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 01, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 2/7/18 -Unknown Spouse of Gissell Caamano |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 02/07/18 @ 8:20 AMParty: Defendant Caamano, Gissell |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 30th day of January, 2018Party: Defendant South Florida 954 Cars Corp |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 01/27/2018 TENANT #1 |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Tiffany J. Eaton, Esq. / Fla. Bar No. 180221Party: Defendant Caamano, Gissell |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GISSELL CAAMANO |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance South Florida 954 Cars. Corp |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Fld & Rec |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance GISSELL CAAMANO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.