Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Bayate, Julio, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Greene, Travis, against Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This is a breach of contract lawsuit whereby plaintiff Julio Bayate sues Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company for damages arising from Tower Hill's failure to pay all benefits due and owing under a homeowners' insurance policy issued to Bayate. Bay...
Request for Production
Date: January 24, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Service
Date: March 12, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 13, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: February 14, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 12, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 12, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 14, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: March 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Dismissed Before Hearing - Pursuant to Settlement | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Vol./Book 0 , Page 0, 2 pages Instrument Number 115020586 |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIESParty: Defendant Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request to Produce Party: Defendant Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Carlos A. Prieto, EsqParty: Defendant Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production FIRSTParty: Plaintiff Bayate, Julio |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.