Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Oriole Golf And Tennis Club Condo One K Assn, filed a(n) Condominium - Property case represented by Mattingly, K Joy, Esq., against Tiramani, June R, represented by Braverman, Steven David, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryCondominium Action |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeCondominium |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by the Oriole Golf & Tennis Club Condominium One K Association, Inc. ("Association") against June R. Tiramani, the unknown spouse of June R. Tiramani, and two unknown tenants. The Association is a condominium association opera...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: February 01, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Certificate of Mailing
Date: February 14, 2019Value Claim Form
Date: January 24, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: March 20, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: March 20, 2018Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem
Date: September 17, 2018Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem
Date: September 17, 2018Report of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: December 28, 2018Answer of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: December 28, 2018Amended
Date: January 16, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: January 23, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: June 20, 2019Affidavit of Costs
Date: April 19, 2019Affidavit for Service by Publication
Date: February 06, 2019Affidavit of Attorney Fees
Date: April 19, 2019Affidavit of Indebtedness
Date: April 19, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 19, 2019Certificate of Disbursements
Date: July 01, 2019Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: May 13, 2019Certificate of Sale
Date: June 18, 2019Bid Sheet
Date: June 18, 2019Motion for Disbursement
Date: June 24, 2019Certificate of Sale
Date: June 21, 2019Notice of Limited Appearance
Date: June 24, 2019Certificate of Title
Date: July 01, 2019Certificate
Date: September 19, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: September 04, 2019Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: September 19, 2019Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: January 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: March 20, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: March 20, 2018Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Administrator
Date: October 01, 2018Answer of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: November 09, 2018Oath of Guardian Attorney & Admin Ad Litem
Date: November 09, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: November 09, 2018Motion for Discharge of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: January 16, 2019Directions to the Clerk
Date: February 01, 2019Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: February 01, 2019Notice of Action
Date: February 14, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: February 25, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: March 14, 2019Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney Fees
Date: April 19, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: April 26, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: May 28, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: July 08, 2019Order Disbursing Funds
Date: October 03, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Check Paid TO MEGAN D WIDMEYER PA TRUST ACCOUNT / PER ORD / $19,869.20 / MAILED; TO BRENDA D FORMAN CLERK / REGSTRY FEE $15.00 |
|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Disbursing Funds | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate Party: Defendant Tiramani, June R |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Hearing | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion To Intervene and Motion to Disburse Surplus Funds is Deferred |
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Check Paid TO ORIOLE GOLF & TENNIS CLUB CONDOMINIUM ONE K ASSOCI PER COD ($13,603.85) MAILED TO ATTY; BECKER & OLIAKOFF PA TRUST ACCOUNT ($5,583.95) MAILED; BRENDA D FORMAN CLERK ($28.00) SURP EDU FUND |
|
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Mailed | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.