Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mccrone, Anthony, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Allen, G William, Jr., against Cloisters Corporation, Swift Management Solutions Inc, represented by Fernandez, Ricardo J, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryNeg - Premises Liability Residential |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Anthony McCrone against The Cloisters Corporation, also known as The Cloister Corporation, doing business as Cloisters Co-op, Cloisters Apartments, and Cloisters Apts, and Swift Management Solutions, Inc. The plaintiff alle...
Interrogatories
Date: October 03, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: November 07, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: November 27, 2018Request for Copies
Date: November 27, 2018Stipulation for-of Settlement
Date: February 28, 2019Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served
Date: March 20, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 12, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: April 12, 2018Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served
Date: April 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 25, 2018Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 25, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 26, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 26, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 19, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 21, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 19, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: September 20, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: October 02, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 02, 2018Reply
Date: October 03, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 02, 2018Request to Produce
Date: October 03, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for-of Settlement DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Interrogatories | |
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply Party: Plaintiff McCrone, Anthony |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Produce | |
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply Party: Plaintiff McCrone, Anthony |
|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.