Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Sofi Consumer Loan Program Grantor Trust 2016-2 Plaintiff vs. Rudy Rojas Defendant
On January 24, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 24, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Closed
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by SoFi Consumer Loan Program Grantor Trust 2016-2 against Rudy Rojas. SoFi Consumer Loan Program Grantor Trust 2016-2 is a plaintiff represented by Zwicker & Associates, P.C. The plaintiff is established in Delaware and w…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Final Disposition Form
Date: Oct 02, 2018Motion
Date: Jun 11, 2018Answer
Date: Feb 19, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Feb 09, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 24, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form Other |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion TO SUBTITUTE PROPER PARTY / NAMED PLAINTIFFParty: Plaintiff Sofi Consumer Loan Program Grantor Trust 2016-2 |
|
February 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSESParty: Defendant Rojas, Rudy |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 2/3/2018Party: Defendant Rojas, Rudy |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: ZORAN D JOVANOVICH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A011624; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: ZORAN D JOVANOVICH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A011624; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance RUDY ROJAS |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Sofi Consumer Loan Program Grantor Trust 2016-2 |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |