Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Sofi Consumer Loan Program Grantor Trust 2016-3, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Mina, Pierre George, Esq., against Rodriguez, Jose, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Fahnestock, Fabienne E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by SoFi Consumer Loan Program Grantor Trust 2016-3 against Jose Rodriguez. SoFi Consumer Loan Program Grantor Trust 2016-3 is a plaintiff represented by Zwicker & Associates, P.C. The plaintiff is established in Delaware and w...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: December 18, 2018Notice of Service
Date: January 02, 2019Motion for Default & Default
Date: March 14, 2019Non-Military Affidavit
Date: March 14, 2019Non-Military Affidavit
Date: March 29, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: March 14, 2019Motion for Final Judgment
Date: March 29, 2019Final Disposition Form
Date: March 29, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: February 06, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: January 02, 2019Affidavit of Costs
Date: March 29, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff Sofi Consumer Loan Program Grantor Trust 2016-3 |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default against JOSE RODRIGUEZParty: Plaintiff Sofi Consumer Loan Program Grantor Trust 2016-3 |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit | |
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESSParty: Plaintiff Sofi Consumer Loan Program Grantor Trust 2016-3 |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service Party: Plaintiff Sofi Consumer Loan Program Grantor Trust 2016-3 |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Party: Plaintiff Sofi Consumer Loan Program Grantor Trust 2016-3 |
|
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.