Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jovanovich, Zoran D, against Baigorria, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by American Express Centurion Bank against Maria Baigorria, also known as Maria T Baigorria. The plaintiff is an industrial bank based in Salt Lake City, Utah. The complaint alleges a breach of contract based on a Credit Accou...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Ex Parte Motion
Date: August 07, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: March 26, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 07, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 27, 2019eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: June 06, 2019Agreed Order
Date: June 05, 2019Final Disposition Form
Date: August 30, 2019Summons Returned Unserved
Date: December 20, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved ATTEMPTED ON MARIA BAIGORRIA A/K/A MARIA T. BAGIGORRIA |
|
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: ZORAN D JOVANOVICH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A081557; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance - Alias MARIA BAIGORRIA AKA MARIA T BAIGORRIA |
|
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO OBTAIN SERVICE |
|
April 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Motion TO OBTAIN SERVICEParty: Plaintiff American Express Centurion Bank |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff American Express Centurion Bank |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved aka Maria T BaigorriaParty: Defendant Baigorria, Maria |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Maria Baigorria |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.