Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Dunlop, Judy, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Stern, Alex A, against Florida Peninsula Insurance Company, represented by Salehi, Tanaz, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Fahnestock, Fabienne E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Judy Dunlop against Florida Peninsula Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that the defendant issued a homeowners' insurance policy to the plaintiff, providing coverage for real property owned by the plaintiff located i...
Notice of Appearance
Date: February 06, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 15, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: March 10, 2018Notice
Date: June 20, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: June 13, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 20, 2018Privilege Log
Date: July 05, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 05, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 10, 2018Exhibits
Date: October 23, 2018Interrogatories
Date: January 24, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 12, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 06, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: February 28, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 19, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: April 09, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 09, 2018Agreed Order
Date: April 10, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 14, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 21, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: July 05, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: June 28, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 05, 2018Notice of Withdrawal
Date: July 06, 2018Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: June 25, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 06, 2018Agreed Order
Date: July 06, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: July 09, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: July 10, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Exhibits COPY OF NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal | |
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order on Motion for Extension of Time |
|
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.