Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Charles, James, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Mineo, Peter John, against Anchor Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Elsasser, Krista L, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by James Charles against Anchor Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint states that the action is for damages in excess of $15,000, exclusive of interest, attorney fees, and costs. It is mentioned that the Defenda...
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 16, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 15, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 30, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: April 05, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: April 16, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 27, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: August 31, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: September 17, 2018Order Resetting
Date: December 05, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: December 05, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: December 06, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: December 04, 2018Motion for Order
Date: October 09, 2018Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: February 14, 2019Re-Notice of Mediation
Date: February 07, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: February 20, 2019Response to Motion
Date: February 28, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 06, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: March 18, 2019Witness List
Date: March 18, 2019Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 16, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: March 08, 2019Witness List
Date: March 18, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: April 01, 2019Request for Production
Date: April 11, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: April 11, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: April 12, 2019Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories
Date: April 16, 2019Request for Production
Date: April 16, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: April 12, 2019Mediation Report
Date: April 17, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: April 17, 2019Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 24, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 23, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 22, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 22, 2018Notice to Set Case for Trial
Date: May 22, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: July 27, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 12, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: February 19, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: March 07, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: April 18, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: March 30, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 24, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Charles, James |
|
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation Of deposition for May 10th, 2019 @ 2:00 p.m |
|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories Party: Defendant Anchor Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Anchor Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum The designated Corporate Representative/Person with Most Knowledge, pursuant to Florida Rule of Civi Procedure 1.310(b)(6) of |
|
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Expert Witness List | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum AMENDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.