Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Primero, Alvaro Jose, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Montero, Hyram M, against Albrecht, Robert, Martell Construction Re Inc, Martell Construction & Restoration Inc, Martell Roofing Inc, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryNeg - Negligence Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Alvaro Jose Primero against Martell Construction & Restoration Inc., Martell Roofing Inc., and Martell Construction RE Inc. The plaintiff, Alvaro Jose Primero, is a resident of New Jersey who was working as a roofer in Flor...
Request to Produce
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: January 24, 2018Request to Produce
Date: January 24, 2018Request to Produce
Date: January 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 26, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 26, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 26, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: January 31, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 13, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 13, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 13, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: February 21, 2018Agreed Order
Date: February 22, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: March 14, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: March 21, 2018Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: March 29, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: April 06, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: April 02, 2018Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: April 06, 2018Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: April 09, 2018Request to Produce
Date: April 09, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: April 09, 2018Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint
Date: April 09, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: May 17, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: May 10, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: June 11, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: May 25, 2018Agreed Order
Date: June 26, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 29, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 11, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 09, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 23, 2018Reply to Answer
Date: July 19, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: July 23, 2018Request for Production
Date: July 23, 2018Notice of Interrogatories
Date: July 23, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 27, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: August 09, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: September 07, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: September 19, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: September 19, 2018Ex Parte Motion
Date: September 19, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: October 03, 2018Notice of Service
Date: October 03, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 09, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: October 18, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 11, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: October 26, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: November 28, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: December 03, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: December 06, 2018Notice
Date: December 19, 2018Order Setting
Date: January 12, 2019Notice
Date: January 31, 2019Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: April 29, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: December 03, 2019Witness List
Date: June 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 02/17/2020 AT 8:45AM COURTROOM 15-165 |
|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Plaintiff Primero, Alvaro Jose |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice TO COURT OF MEDIATORParty: Plaintiff Primero, Alvaro Jose |
|
January 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting CALENDAR CALL 10/11/19 |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ROBERT ALBRECHTParty: Plaintiff Primero, Alvaro Jose | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production of Documents TO DEFENDANTS MARTELL CONSTRUCTION & RESTORATION, INC., MARTELL ROOFING. INC.; MARTELL CONSTRUCION RE INCParty: Defendant Albrecht, Robert |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.