Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Brown-Williams, Teresa, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Gold Coast Property Management Inc, Lauderdale Marketplace Investments Llc, represented by Buyers, Jan Darlow, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryNeg - Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Teresa Brown-Williams against Lauderdale Marketplace Investments, LLC and Gold Coast Property Management, Inc. The complaint alleges negligence and seeks damages in excess of $15,000. The plaintiff claims that on April 19, ...
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 14, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 16, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: April 20, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 02, 2018Request to Produce
Date: March 14, 2018Request for Production
Date: June 06, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 09, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 22, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 14, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 20, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: July 10, 2018Certificate of Service of Interrogatories
Date: August 15, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: July 10, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 13, 2018Notice
Date: November 06, 2018Request for Production
Date: August 15, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 26, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: December 11, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: March 13, 2019Motion to Withdraw
Date: December 13, 2018Request for Production
Date: December 26, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: December 27, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: January 29, 2019Joint Stipulation
Date: March 08, 2019Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: March 11, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: March 12, 2019Privilege Log
Date: April 09, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 09, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 31, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: August 27, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: April 09, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 18, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: August 05, 2019Notice of Compliance
Date: August 08, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: September 12, 2019Motion to Withdraw
Date: September 06, 2019Motion to Withdraw
Date: September 10, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: June 12, 2020Order to Withdraw As Counsel
Date: September 19, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: February 21, 2018Notice
Date: April 09, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 22, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: June 21, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: July 20, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: November 16, 2018Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: March 20, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 08, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: July 14, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 08-20-2020 8:45 AM |
|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 07-13-2020 at 8:45 am rm 15175 |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Withdraw As Counsel Case Management Conference is Rescheduled for November 7, 2019 |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw AMENDED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS RECORD COUNSEL AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESCHEDULE CASE MAAGEMENT CONFERENCEParty: Plaintiff Brown-Williams, Teresa |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Party: Plaintiff Brown-Williams, Teresa |
|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 09-23-2019 8:45 AM |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Sworn and better Answers to InterrogatoriesParty: Defendant Lauderdale MarketPlace Investments LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.