Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Chand, Rajesh, filed a(n) Other case represented by Seigel, Daniel A, against Lindsey-Green, Lorraine, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Rajesh Chand against Lorraine Lindsey-Green. Rajesh is seeking to recover life insurance proceeds that Lorraine has misappropriated in her capacity as custodian for Rajesh. The life insurance policy was purchased by Ganesh ...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 01, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: March 12, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: March 01, 2018Affidavit
Date: March 12, 2018Motion for Final Judgment of Default
Date: March 12, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit OF DEBTParty: Plaintiff Chand, Rajesh |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Final Judgment of Default Party: Plaintiff Chand, Rajesh |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 2/7/2018Party: Defendant Lindsey-Green, Lorraine |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default Party: Defendant Lindsey-Green, Lorraine |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance LORRAINE LINDSEY-GREEN |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Chand, Rajesh |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: DANIEL SEIGEL ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A011611; ;Amount: $10.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.