Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Sofi Consumer Loan Program Grantor Trust 2016-2, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jovanovich, Zoran D, against Verdon, Brian, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by SoFi Consumer Loan Program Grantor Trust 2016-2 against Brian Verdon. SoFi Consumer Loan Program Grantor Trust 2016-2 is a plaintiff represented by Zwicker & Associates, P.C. The plaintiff is established in Delaware and was...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Ex Parte Motion
Date: October 12, 2018Motion for Default Final Judgment
Date: April 20, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted
Date: March 01, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: October 16, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: December 03, 2018eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: December 28, 2018eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: October 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 17, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: February 20, 2019Motion for Default & Default
Date: February 20, 2019Non-Military Affidavit
Date: February 20, 2019Non-Military Affidavit
Date: April 20, 2019Final Disposition Form
Date: April 20, 2019Affidavit of Costs
Date: April 20, 2019Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Date: July 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy CASE NO 20-17215-PGHParty: Defendant Verdon, Brian |
|
April 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff SoFi Consumer Loan Program Grantor Trust 2016-2 |
|
April 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit | |
April 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
April 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESSParty: Plaintiff SoFi Consumer Loan Program Grantor Trust 2016-2 |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default against BRIAN VERDONParty: Plaintiff SoFi Consumer Loan Program Grantor Trust 2016-2 |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served January 12, 2019 at 3:10pmParty: Defendant Verdon, Brian |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: ZORAN D JOVANOVICH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A172575; ;Amount: $10.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.