Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Sofi Consumer Loan Program 2017-1 Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jovanovich, Zoran D, against Rittinger, Richard, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by SoFi Consumer Loan Program 2017-1 LLC against Richard Rittinger. SoFi Consumer Loan Program 2017-1 LLC is a Delaware-based plaintiff that was assigned Defendant's account(s) by SoFi Lending Corp. The defendant resides in Br...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: March 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: April 12, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: August 30, 2018Order
Date: September 24, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: August 30, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: August 29, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: August 30, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 09, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order On Pre Trial Conference |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved UNKNOWN TENANT #2 |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 8/16/2018 UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PATRICK SINCLAIR LAMAR NKA PATRICK SINCLAIR LAMAR |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved UNKNOWN TENANT #1 |
|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 08/07/18 UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VERNON RALPH LAMAR |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 4/2/2018Party: Defendant Rittinger, Richard |
|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: ZORAN D JOVANOVICH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A038740; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance - Alias Richard Rittinger |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Party: Defendant Rittinger, Richard |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff SoFi Consumer Loan Program 2017-1 LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.