Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Adheen, Trevor T, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Pro Se, against Miller Law Associate, Rodriguez, Alexandra, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2018 |
CategoryProfessional Malpractice - Business |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is an action for damages in the amount specified by the plaintiff against the defendant. The plaintiff alleges that the defendant, Alexandra Rodriguez, conspired, collaborated, and colluded with Jeffrey A. Miller of Miller Law Associat...
Civil Application Indigent Status
Date: January 23, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 16, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 16, 2018Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: March 21, 2018Return of Service Served
Date: March 28, 2018Motion
Date: April 02, 2018Motion
Date: April 02, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 23, 2018Complaint
Date: January 23, 2018Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted
Date: February 27, 2018Motion to Consolidate
Date: March 16, 2018Motion
Date: April 02, 2018Motion
Date: April 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion TO DENY SUMMARY JUDGMENTParty: Plaintiff Adheen, Trevor T |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion TO DENY AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: Motion to TransferParty: Plaintiff Adheen, Trevor T |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion TO DENY LOW NUMBER TRANSFER AND TO CONSOLIDATEParty: Plaintiff Adheen, Trevor T |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion TO DENY ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSESParty: Plaintiff Adheen, Trevor T |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Served 03/09/2018Party: Defendant Rodriguez, Alexandra |
|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Hearing | |
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Rodriguez, Alexandra |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Party: Defendant Rodriguez, Alexandra |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Consolidate Party: Defendant Rodriguez, Alexandra |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted ALEXANDRA RODRIGUEZParty: Defendant Rodriguez, Alexandra |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.