Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Collins, Edice Elaine, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Bolton, Richard, against Wal-Mart Stores East Lp, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryNeg - Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Edice Elaine Collins against Walmart Stores, Inc. The plaintiff is seeking compensatory damages in excess of $15,000. The complaint alleges that on December 11, 2016, the plaintiff visited the Walmart store located at 3306 ...
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Motion to Amend
Date: November 07, 2018Request for Production
Date: February 22, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: November 08, 2018Notice of Interrogatories
Date: February 22, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 22, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: August 16, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 22, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: August 17, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 30, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: August 22, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: August 20, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 15, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 30, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 16, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: April 20, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 02, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: July 02, 2018Agreed Order
Date: April 23, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: August 29, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: August 24, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 31, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 30, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 27, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 30, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 12, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 14, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 29, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: August 09, 2018Certificate of Service of Interrogatories
Date: January 24, 2018Certificate
Date: November 06, 2018Certificate
Date: November 06, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 09, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 24, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: August 09, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: August 15, 2018Mediation Report
Date: November 07, 2018Agreed Order
Date: November 07, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Amend Party: Plaintiff Collins, Edice Elaine |
|
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint by Interlineation /Granted |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate Party: Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF AUTHORITYParty: Plaintiff Collins, Edice Elaine |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.