Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Israel, Scott J, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Mackenzie, Kristin Gail, against Reyes, Denny Espinosa, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryForfeiture |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a verified complaint for forfeiture filed by Scott J. Israel, Sheriff of Broward County, Florida. The complaint is filed in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The complaint is in regards to th...
Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 06, 2018Alias Summons Returned Served
Date: February 21, 2018eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: February 06, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: April 19, 2018Petition (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Copy of Receipt for Cash Bond
Date: January 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 25, 2018Notice of Forfeiture Proceedings
Date: March 12, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: April 19, 2018Final Disposition Form
Date: June 01, 2018Motion for Default
Date: April 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Check Paid TO SCOTT J ISRAEL AS SHERIFF OF BROWARD CTY PER ORD ($1,500.00) MAILED |
|
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Final Order of ForfeitureParty: Plaintiff Israel, Scott J |
|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default againstParty: Defendant Reyes, Denny Espinosa |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Forfeiture Proceedings TO: DENNY ESPINOSA REYES and ALL PERSONS who may claimParty: Plaintiff Israel, Scott J |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Alias Summons Returned Served 19th day of February, 2018Party: Defendant Reyes, Denny Espinosa |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Not Served |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance - Alias Issued On: Denny Espinosa Reyes |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: KRISTIN MACKENZIE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A018841; ;Amount: $10.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.