Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Perreta, John, Reis, Joselina, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Schirmer, Christopher V, Schirmer, Christopher Vaughn, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Rodriguez, Lazaro C, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with McCarthy, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by John Perreta and Joselina Reis against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are seeking damages exceeding $15,000. The plaintiffs own a property in Plantation, FL, and the defendant is a licensed ...
Motion in Limine
Date: August 05, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 29, 2019Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 04, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 28, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: July 08, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 27, 2019Motion for Rehearing
Date: August 30, 2019Notice of Non Objection to Production
Date: August 27, 2019Notice of Change of Address
Date: September 20, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: August 05, 2019Notice of Change of Address
Date: September 28, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 05, 2019Motion to Compel/Impose Sanctions
Date: May 02, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: August 30, 2019Re-Notice of Mediation
Date: April 09, 2019Order Denying
Date: April 09, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: October 16, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 06, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: August 05, 2019Witness List
Date: April 09, 2019Motion to Strike Expert Witness
Date: July 09, 2019Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 06, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: November 09, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: July 17, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Order Granting Rehearing & Resetting
Date: September 05, 2019Request for Admissions
Date: January 24, 2018Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: May 03, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 24, 2018Motion to Compel Production
Date: November 29, 2018Subpoena Returned Served
Date: August 06, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: May 17, 2018Good Faith Form
Date: December 03, 2018Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: August 06, 2019Exhibit List
Date: May 03, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: July 25, 2019Subpoena Returned Served
Date: September 06, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: June 05, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 09, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: May 17, 2018Witness List
Date: May 03, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: May 09, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: July 25, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 07, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: September 06, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: July 02, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 05, 2018Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part
Date: December 03, 2018Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: July 16, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 06, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: July 30, 2018Certificate
Date: May 11, 2019Request to Produce
Date: July 30, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 07, 2019Agreed Order
Date: July 26, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: September 17, 2019Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: August 08, 2019Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: August 08, 2019Consent to Substitution of Counsel
Date: May 11, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: December 10, 2018Order Denying
Date: September 17, 2019Motion for Default
Date: December 26, 2018Order Resetting
Date: August 08, 2019Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: July 30, 2019Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 30, 2019Response
Date: September 18, 2019Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: May 11, 2019Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: May 13, 2019Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: December 28, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 23, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: August 09, 2019Notice of Readiness for Trial
Date: January 04, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: July 30, 2019Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: January 09, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: May 14, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 14, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: August 14, 2019Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: January 09, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 11, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 23, 2019Notice of Service
Date: January 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: January 18, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: January 18, 2019Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: August 27, 2018Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: May 30, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 29, 2019Order
Date: August 15, 2019Request for Production
Date: February 01, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: February 11, 2019Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: March 11, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: February 19, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: August 22, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: March 21, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: March 11, 2019Notice of Interrogatories
Date: February 01, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 03, 2019Subpoena Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: August 23, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: October 10, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 26, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: January 31, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: August 01, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: July 31, 2019Mediation Report
Date: June 07, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 19, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 01, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 26, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 26, 2019Response to Motion
Date: April 08, 2019Motion for Default
Date: March 02, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 16, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: March 16, 2018Response to Motion
Date: August 01, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: August 28, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 24, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: March 30, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: July 17, 2019Response to Motion
Date: August 01, 2019Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 06, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: October 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENTParty: Plaintiff Perreta, John Plaintiff Reis, Joselina Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENTParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company Plaintiff Reis, Joselina Plaintiff Perreta, John | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR REHEARING, RECONSIDERATION, AND/OR CLARIFICATION OF CURT'S 8/15/2019 ORDER AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONSParty: Plaintiff Perreta, John Plaintiff Reis, Joselina |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Denying DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Served SERVED RECORDS CUSTODIAN INTERNATIONAL CONTENTS EXPERTS, INC BY SERVING REGISTERED AGENT CLEMENS PESHI ON SEPTEMBER 4, 2019 AT 1:30 PM |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Granting Rehearing & Resetting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.