Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Langley, Areta, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Magram, David Scott, against Broward County, represented by Dimatteo, Daniel J, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryNeg - Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a summons issued by the Circuit Court of the 174th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff, Areta Langley, is suing Broward County. The summons commands Broward County to serve a copy of the complaint or petition ...
Request to Produce
Date: January 24, 2018Interrogatories
Date: January 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised
Date: January 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 06, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 19, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 16, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 09, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: April 09, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 09, 2018Request for Production
Date: April 09, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: June 05, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 26, 2018Ex Parte Motion
Date: May 21, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: October 11, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: July 11, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: September 19, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: November 12, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: March 01, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: January 16, 2019Order on Motion to Compel
Date: March 18, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: May 17, 2019Notice of Video Deposition
Date: June 28, 2019Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: July 01, 2020Exhibits
Date: July 13, 2020eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 06, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 14, 2018Order Compelling Discovery
Date: May 21, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: July 20, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: October 24, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: July 03, 2019Notice
Date: August 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibits JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of co counsel |
|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition Areta Langley |
|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Broward County |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Order on Motion to Compel | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASE OF RECORDSParty: Defendant Broward County |
|
November 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel MEDIATION / TO SET CASE FOR TRIALParty: Plaintiff Langley, Areta |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.