Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sidney Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Fernley, Brennah E, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Haury, William W., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryForeign Judgment (Civil) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: June 27, 2022Subpoena Returned Served
Date: March 30, 2022Notice
Date: January 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Affidavit in Support
Date: January 16, 2018Affidavit of Compliance/Judgment Attached (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: April 21, 2022Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: June 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351 | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served Honda Lease Trust |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Subpoena Returned Served | |
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: JOE ECKELKAMP ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A009198; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENTParty: Plaintiff Sidney Federal Credit Union |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support OF DOMESTICATION OF FOREIGN JUDGMENTParty: Plaintiff Sidney Federal Credit Union |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Compliance/Judgment Attached (eFiled) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.