Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hamilton, Deswin, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Bernstein, John Stat, against Citizens Property Insurance Company, represented by Trushin, Bradley H., Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Deswin Hamilton against Citizens Property Insurance Company for declaratory relief. Deswin Hamilton is a resident of Broward County, Florida and owns a property located at 4220 SW Street, West Park, FL 33023. Citizens Prope...
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: February 26, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 10, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: April 05, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 06, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: August 16, 2018Agreed Order
Date: August 17, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: August 16, 2018Notice
Date: September 28, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 26, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 28, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 07, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 26, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 26, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 10, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 10, 2018Notice
Date: May 10, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: May 14, 2018Notice of Change of Address
Date: June 04, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: June 19, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 19, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: June 25, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 11, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: July 11, 2018Memorandum of Law
Date: September 12, 2018Order Deferring
Date: September 11, 2018Memo
Date: September 13, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: October 30, 2018Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: October 31, 2018Case Management Order
Date: October 05, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 07, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: June 25, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Hamilton, Deswin |
|
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order 10-31-18 @ 8:45 am rm 15175 |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PENDING SETTLEMENTParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Company | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memo DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RELATING TO DFENDANT'S DEPOSITION OF EAST COAST CLAIMS CONSULTANT GROUPParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Company |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Law | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Deferring PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RELATING TO DEFENDANT'S DEPOSITION OF EAST COAST CLAIMS CONSLTANT GROUP |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF'S PLUMBER, JESUS VICTOR PEREZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.