Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Castro, Alicia, Gonzalez, Eusebio, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Berman, Russell, Stallone, Joseph F, against Pacific Sunwear Of California Llc, represented by Arsenault, Shannon, Esq., Olmsted, Matthew R, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryNeg - Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Response to Request for Production
Date: November 28, 2018Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: March 29, 2019Request for Admissions
Date: March 29, 2019Request for Production
Date: March 29, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: April 23, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: May 03, 2019Response to Request for Admissions
Date: May 03, 2019Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 03, 2019Subpoena Filed
Date: June 28, 2019Subpoena Filed
Date: June 28, 2019Mediation Report
Date: July 02, 2019Answer to Request for Admissions
Date: July 15, 2019Response to Request for Admissions
Date: July 16, 2019Order
Date: July 22, 2019Request for Production
Date: August 01, 2019Supplemental Request for Admissions
Date: August 01, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: August 05, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: August 12, 2019Request for Production of Documents
Date: August 05, 2019Response to Request for Admissions
Date: August 07, 2019Request for Production
Date: September 24, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: October 03, 2019Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories
Date: January 16, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: February 12, 2020Order Granting Motion
Date: March 20, 2020Order to Compel
Date: April 21, 2020Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: March 19, 2020Order Denying Motion to Strike
Date: April 21, 2020Expert Witness List
Date: April 28, 2020Request for Production
Date: May 11, 2020Motion to Strike Expert Witness
Date: May 06, 2020Response
Date: May 18, 2020Motion for Leave
Date: May 21, 2020Request for Production
Date: May 21, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: May 22, 2020Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 02, 2020Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: June 04, 2020Opposition
Date: June 24, 2020Order Denying Motion to Strike
Date: June 25, 2020Order Granting Motion
Date: June 25, 2020Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: August 16, 2021Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation
Date: August 05, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: August 02, 2021Subpoena for Trial
Date: August 04, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 05, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 13, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 11, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 18, 2022Order Granting Motion to Amend
Date: August 11, 2021Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: September 16, 2021Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 18, 2022Notice of Unavailability
Date: January 12, 2022Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 23, 2021Request for Production
Date: January 28, 2022Request
Date: August 05, 2021Request for Production
Date: August 15, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: September 21, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: December 04, 2018Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: July 27, 2020Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: January 28, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: July 28, 2021Disclosure of Exhibits
Date: August 03, 2021Motion for Continuance
Date: August 11, 2021Objection
Date: August 11, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: August 11, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 20, 2021Agreed Order
Date: August 12, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 16, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 28, 2022Request for Admissions
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 17, 2018Interrogatories
Date: January 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 20, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 20, 2018Amendment to Complaint
Date: March 20, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Filing
Date: March 20, 2018Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 26, 2018Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 19, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 19, 2018Request for Production
Date: July 13, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: July 13, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 09, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: July 10, 2018Notice of Interrogatories
Date: July 13, 2018Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 20, 2018Agreed Order
Date: July 31, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: July 30, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 02, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: August 13, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: August 14, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: August 15, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: September 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer & Affirmative Defenses | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion for Continuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.