Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
U S Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hodo, Aleisha Denise, against Hernandez, Jose Aristides, Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, represented by Bilu, Geil S, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a mortgage foreclosure complaint filed by U.S. Bank National Association, acting as the trustee for Merrill Lynch First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2007-2, against defendants Jose Ar...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018Value Claim Form
Date: January 17, 2018Lis Pendens
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: April 23, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 26, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 26, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: March 07, 2018Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: March 01, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: February 28, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: March 07, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: March 01, 2018Notice of Service
Date: April 02, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 09, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: March 07, 2018Motion for Default
Date: March 01, 2018Motion for Default
Date: April 02, 2018Default
Date: March 01, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: March 01, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: April 24, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 23, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: April 24, 2018Motion for Default
Date: April 24, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 18, 2018Motion for Default
Date: May 21, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 24, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 29, 2018Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 29, 2018Notice of Service
Date: May 22, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: July 16, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 29, 2018Notice of Service
Date: July 16, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: July 18, 2018Affidavit
Date: July 16, 2018Motion to Withdraw
Date: July 18, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 03, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: August 06, 2018Notice of Service
Date: August 20, 2018Witness & Exhibit List
Date: March 11, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: August 06, 2018Notice of Prod of Documents
Date: March 16, 2019Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 28, 2018Order Setting
Date: September 12, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 26, 2019Order Granting Default
Date: September 12, 2018Notice of Service
Date: September 20, 2018Order Setting
Date: September 12, 2018Motion for Default Jgmt
Date: September 04, 2018Witness & Exhibit List
Date: September 20, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 27, 2019Order Setting
Date: June 28, 2019Affidavit of Attorney Fees
Date: March 21, 2019Witness & Exhibit List
Date: April 15, 2019Witness & Exhibit List
Date: July 09, 2019Notice of Service
Date: July 05, 2019Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: October 02, 2019Witness & Exhibit List
Date: September 27, 2019Order Setting
Date: October 02, 2019Witness & Exhibit List
Date: October 07, 2019Order Setting
Date: October 02, 2019Notice of Service
Date: October 10, 2019Motion to Vacate Order
Date: January 09, 2020Witness & Exhibit List
Date: November 14, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: January 09, 2020Order Setting Aside
Date: January 14, 2020Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: January 14, 2020Cross Notice
Date: January 13, 2020Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: January 14, 2020Motion to Amend Complaint
Date: January 15, 2020Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: April 16, 2020Notice of Service
Date: February 06, 2020Notice of Service
Date: February 04, 2020Final Disposition Form
Date: February 19, 2020Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: March 16, 2020Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: March 16, 2020Notice of Change of Address
Date: July 02, 2020Notice of Service
Date: March 18, 2020Request for Admissions
Date: January 17, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: April 23, 2018Motion for Default
Date: July 18, 2018Notice of Withdrawal
Date: August 07, 2018Motion to Withdraw
Date: March 19, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: March 19, 2019Order Setting
Date: March 27, 2019Notice of Service
Date: April 12, 2019Order Setting
Date: June 28, 2019Amended Witness List
Date: July 29, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: January 14, 2020Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 03, 2018Motion to Amend Complaint
Date: December 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 06-15-2020 at 8:45 am rm 15160 |
|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 04-20-2020 8:45 AM |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Amend Complaint Party: Plaintiff U S Bank National Association |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Aside On Motion to Vacate Order / Motion to Amend Complaint and Motion to Amend Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.