Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mendez, Christopher, Mendez, Elena, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Haritan, Chelsea E, Esq., against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Rodriguez, Lazaro C, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Elena Mendez and Christopher Mendez against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiffs allege breach of contract and seek damages exceeding $15,000. The defendant is an insurance company authorized to i...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Discovery
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 07, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 17, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 28, 2018Consent to Substitution of Counsel
Date: May 11, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 28, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: March 15, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: March 01, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 26, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 14, 2018Stipulation & Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: May 18, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: May 11, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: September 13, 2018Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: September 13, 2018Order
Date: October 11, 2018Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: October 24, 2018Agreed Order
Date: October 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 23, 2018Motion for Mediation
Date: August 29, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Amended Complaint AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIALParty: Defendant Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company |
|
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Agreed Order | |
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order on motion to dismiss - Denied |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Hearing | |
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Mediation EMERGENCYParty: Plaintiff Mendez, Elena Plaintiff Mendez, Christopher |
|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Mediation EMERGENCYParty: Plaintiff Mendez, Christopher Plaintiff Mendez, Elena |
|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order for Substitution of Counsel | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company |
|
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Consent to Substitution of Counsel Party: Attorney Brant, Todd E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.