Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Gordon Food Service Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Bloch, Bruce E, against Rsc Hidden Oaks Fort Myers Llc, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Gordon Food Service, Inc. against RSC Hidden Oaks Fort Myers, LLC. The plaintiff alleges that they entered into a contract with the defendant on or about March 27, 2015, where the plaintiff agreed to deliver goods and mater...
Summons Returned Served
Date: January 26, 2018Affidavit in Support of Motion
Date: November 14, 2018Directions to the Clerk
Date: January 23, 2019Certificate of Service
Date: July 10, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: October 17, 2018Motion for Default Jgmt
Date: November 14, 2018Affidavit of Attorney Fees
Date: November 14, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: December 13, 2018Affidavit of Attorney Fees
Date: January 04, 2019Certificate of Service
Date: January 04, 2019Certificate of Service
Date: January 29, 2019Motion for Garnishment After Judgment
Date: January 29, 2019eWrit Issuance - Garnishment
Date: January 29, 2019Certificate of Service
Date: February 07, 2019Writ of Garnishment Returned Served
Date: February 07, 2019Answer of Garnishee
Date: February 26, 2019Notice of Garnishment to Defendant
Date: March 06, 2019Motion for Judgment in Garnishment
Date: April 09, 2019Exhibits
Date: July 09, 2019Final Judgment in Garnishment
Date: July 09, 2019Satisfaction of Judgment in Garnishment
Date: August 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment in Garnishment Garnishee: Florida Community Bank |
|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Party: Plaintiff Gordon Food Service Inc |
|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Exhibits | |
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Final Judgment in Garnishment | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Judgment in Garnishment Party: Plaintiff Gordon Food Service Inc |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Garnishment to Defendant | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer of Garnishee AMENDED/ GARNISHEE SYNOVUS BANK |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENTParty: Plaintiff Gordon Food Service Inc |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment Returned Served | |
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ Fee Payor: SAPURSTEIN BLOCH P.A. ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A019016; ;Amount: $85.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.