Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Viola, Kelly, Viola, Peter, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Cassel, Michael A, Esq., against Security First Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Peter Viola and Kelly Viola against Security First Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $15,000. The complaint alleges that the plaintiffs owned real and personal property located in Broward Co...
Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 20, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 22, 2018Request to Produce
Date: April 17, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 23, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 20, 2018Notice of Filing Interrogs
Date: April 17, 2018Memo
Date: June 12, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: May 21, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: June 01, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: September 05, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 01, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 23, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: June 07, 2018Stipulation
Date: October 15, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation FOR ORDER OF DISMISSALParty: Plaintiff Viola, Peter Plaintiff Viola, Kelly Defendant Security First Insurance Company |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIESParty: Plaintiff Viola, Peter Plaintiff Viola, Kelly |
|
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order For Protective Order as to Deposition Duces Tecum of Security First's Corporate Official |
|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memo IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOT FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERParty: Plaintiff Viola, Peter |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.