Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Farkas, Rachel, against Arbor Keys Condominium Ass Inc, Joseph, Links, Marcos Usa Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, represented by Van Horn, Chad T, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a verified complaint to foreclose a mortgage. The plaintiff, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as trustee for the registered holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2006-HE6, sues Marcos USA Inc., Mortgage Electronic ...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Certificate of Title
Date: October 09, 2018Letter Returned From Post Office
Date: November 27, 2018Value Claim Form
Date: January 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018Lis Pendens
Date: January 17, 2018Answer
Date: February 23, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 27, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 27, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 27, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 27, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 27, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: March 20, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: March 20, 2018Amended
Date: March 29, 2018Mortgage Note
Date: May 08, 2018Affidavit of Indebtedness
Date: May 08, 2018Affidavit of Attorney Fees
Date: May 08, 2018Motion to Set Aside Default
Date: May 08, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: May 10, 2018Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: June 01, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 12, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 19, 2018Final Disposition Form
Date: June 27, 2018Certificate of Mailing
Date: July 03, 2018Certificate of Mailing
Date: July 10, 2018Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: July 13, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: July 27, 2018Certificate of Sale
Date: September 26, 2018Bid Sheet
Date: September 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 27, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 28, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 08, 2018Order
Date: June 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Letter Returned From Post Office | |
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title Mailed | |
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale & Proof of Publication Mailed | |
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale | |
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
September 25, 2018 | Hearing | Foreclosure Sale | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Sale Fee Payor: Casey Mattis ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20181RA1A004042; ;Amount: $70.00 |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication September 25, 2018 |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney September 25, 2018 at 10:00 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.